+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 31, 2006 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 109-229.
- Signed by President.
On May 25, 2006 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On May 22, 2006 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1736 .
On May 22, 2006 in the Senate:
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Shays moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On May 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 251.
- Reported by the Committee on Government Reform. H. Rept. 109-449 .
On March 9, 2006 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On October 20, 2005 in the Senate:
- By Senator Collins from Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs filed written report. Report No. 109-158 .
On October 20, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Government Reform.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Received in the House.
On October 19, 2005 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On September 27, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 227.
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Collins without amendment. Without written report.
On September 22, 2005 in the Senate:
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On September 20, 2005 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor