+ − Summary
+ − Actions (15)
On August 29, 1980 in the Senate:
- Public Law 96-333.
- Signed by President.
On August 21, 1980 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On August 20, 1980 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On August 19, 1980 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
- Measure passed House.
- Measure considered in House.
- Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs discharged in House.
On January 24, 1980 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
On January 22, 1980 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Call of calendar in Senate.
On December 7, 1979 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Select Committee on Indian Affairs, S. Rept. 96-468.
On September 10, 1979 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Select Committee on Indian Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor