+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (8)
On December 9, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
- Received in the House.
On December 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8499-8500; text as passed Senate: CR S8499-8500)
On December 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 306.
- Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
On November 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On July 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S4843)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor