+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 14, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 112-101.
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- Mr. Denham moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1710 .
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On December 20, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
On December 19, 2011 in the House:
- Received in the House.
- Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
On December 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent.
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor