+ − Actions (16)
On October 12, 1982 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Crime.
On October 1, 1982 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
On September 30, 1982 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments and an amendment to the Title by Yea-Nay Vote. 93-1. Record Vote No: 380.
- Considered by Senate.
- S.UP.AMDT.1348 Amendment SU 1348 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.UP.AMDT.1348 Proposed by Senator Byrd, of WV for Senator Kennedy. To provide for federal prosecution under this Act only where the local prosecuting authority requests or concurs in such federal prosecution.
On September 24, 1982 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Regular Orders. Calendar No. 855.
- Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Specter with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 97-585.
On September 21, 1982 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On June 3, 1982 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Juvenile Justice. Approved for full committee consideration with amendments favorably.
On January 28, 1982 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Juvenile Justice. Hearings held.
On December 10, 1981 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Juvenile Justice. Hearings held.
On October 26, 1981 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Juvenile Justice. Hearings held.
On October 6, 1981 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary. Referred jointly to the Subcommittee on Juvenile Justice.
- Committee on Judiciary. Referred jointly to the Subcommittee on Criminal Law.
On October 1, 1981 in the Senate:
- Read second time and referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Amendment
S.UP.AMDT.1348
To provide for federal prosecution under this Act only where the local prosecuting authority requests or concurs in such federal prosecution.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor