+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On October 11, 2000 in the House:
- Held at the desk.
- Received in the House.
On October 11, 2000 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 10, 2000 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent.
On August 25, 2000 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 761.
- Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator McCain under authority of the order of the Senate of 07/26/2000 with amendments. With written report No. 106-385 .
On June 15, 2000 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
On October 5, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor