+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On December 19, 2003 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 108-196.
- Signed by President.
On December 11, 2003 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On December 8, 2003 in the House:
- Committee on Government Reform discharged.
- Received in the House.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Referred to the House Committee on Government Reform.
- Mrs. Davis, Jo Ann asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
- Considered by unanimous consent.
- On passage Passed without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- Cleared for White House.
On November 25, 2003 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On November 22, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 409.
- Committee on Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Collins without amendment. With written report No. 108-207 .
On October 22, 2003 in the Senate:
- Committee on Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On October 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- Committee on Governmental Affairs referred to Subcommittee on Oversight of Government Management, the Federal Workforce, and the District of Columbia.
On September 30, 2003 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor