+ − Actions (6)
On October 19, 1981 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Oversight of the IRS. Hearings held.
On October 14, 1981 in the Senate:
- Committee on Finance requested executive comment from OMB; Treasury Department.
On October 7, 1981 in the Senate:
- Star Print ordered on S.1673 .
On September 30, 1981 in the Senate:
- Committee on Finance requested executive comment from OMB; Treasury Department.
On September 28, 1981 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Oversight of the IRS took the following actions.
- Read second time and referred to Senate Committee on Finance.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor