+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On September 24, 1996 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 104-202.
- Signed by President.
On September 13, 1996 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On September 11, 1996 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On passage Passed without objection.
- Considered by unanimous consent.
- Mr. Stump asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
- Held at the desk.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Received in the House.
On September 10, 1996 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- Senate Committee on Veterans discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On April 15, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor