+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 126.
- Committee on Appropriations. Original measure reported to Senate by Senator Murkowski. With written report No. 114-70.
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee on Appropriations Senate Subcommittee on Department of the Interior, Environment, and Related Agencies. Hearings held prior to introduction and/or referral. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 114-185.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee on Appropriations Senate Subcommittee on Department of the Interior, Environment, and Related Agencies. Hearings held prior to introduction and/or referral. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 114-185.
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee on Appropriations Senate Subcommittee on Department of the Interior, Environment, and Related Agencies. Hearings held prior to introduction and/or referral. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 114-185.
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee on Appropriations Senate Subcommittee on Department of the Interior, Environment, and Related Agencies. Hearings held prior to introduction and/or referral. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 114-185.
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee on Appropriations Senate Subcommittee on Department of the Interior, Environment, and Related Agencies. Hearings held prior to introduction and/or referral. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 114-185.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor