+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 117-8.
- Signed by President.
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1754-1755)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 164.
- Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1783-1784)
- Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 412 - 8 (Roll no. 101).(text: CR H1754)
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 412 - 8 (Roll no. 101). (text: CR H1754)
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Held at the desk.
- Received in the House.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S1021)
- Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S1021)
- Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1021)
- Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S1021)
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
- Introduced in Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor