+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On January 6, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
On December 16, 2011 in the House:
- Received in the House.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Referred to House Judiciary
- Referred to House Energy and Commerce
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On December 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- S.AMDT.1464 Amendment SA 1464 proposed by Senator Durbin for Senator Feinstein. In the nature of a substitute.
- S.AMDT.1464 Amendment SA 1464 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On October 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee on United States Senate Caucus on International Narcotics Control. Hearings held.
On September 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.1464
In the nature of a substitute.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor