+ − Summary
+ − Actions (13)
On August 18, 1987 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 100-100.
- Signed by President.
On August 12, 1987 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On August 7, 1987 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House by Unanimous Consent.
- House Committee on Agriculture Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On August 6, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Forest, Family Farms, and Energy.
- Subcommittee on Forest, Family Farms, and Energy Discharged.
- Referred to House Committee on Agriculture.
On August 6, 1987 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On August 5, 1987 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Voice Vote.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor