+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On December 9, 1999 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 106-166.
- Signed by President.
On December 1, 1999 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On November 18, 1999 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On passage Passed without objection.
- Considered by unanimous consent.
- Mr. Cooksey asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
- Committee on Transportation discharged.
On October 13, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, Hazardous Materials and Pipeline Transportation.
On October 12, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Received in the House.
On October 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
On September 29, 1999 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 292.
- Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported to Senate by Senator Chafee without amendment. Without written report.
- Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On September 16, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor