+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On December 1, 2003 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 108-141.
- Signed by President.
On November 19, 2003 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On November 17, 2003 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1590 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Duncan moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On November 6, 2003 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On October 30, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Government Reform.
- Received in the House.
On October 30, 2003 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 29, 2003 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On October 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 330.
- Committee on Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Collins without amendment. Without written report.
On October 22, 2003 in the Senate:
- Committee on Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On September 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor