+ − Summary
+ − Actions (18)
On October 4, 1988 in the Senate:
- Became Private Law No: 100-19.
- Signed by President.
On September 27, 1988 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On September 22, 1988 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House on Call of Private Calendar.
On August 8, 1988 in the House:
- Placed on Private Calendar No: 66.
- Reported to House by House Committee on The Judiciary. Report No: 100-850.
On June 3, 1988 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Immigration, Refugees, and International Law.
On May 26, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
On May 26, 1988 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On May 25, 1988 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
On May 19, 1988 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 676.
- Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Byrd for Senator Biden without amendment. With written report No. 100-348.
On May 12, 1988 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On October 20, 1987 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Immigration and Refugee Affairs.
On August 3, 1987 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor