+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On October 27, 1986 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 99-562.
- Signed by President.
On October 17, 1986 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 7, 1986 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 7, 1986 in the Senate:
- House Agreed to Senate Amendments to House Amendments by Unanimous Consent.
On October 3, 1986 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in the House amendment with an amendment by Voice Vote.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- S.AMDT.3214 Amendment SP 3214 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.3214 Proposed by Senator Stevens for Senator Grassley. In the nature of a substitute.
On September 10, 1986 in the House:
- Message on House action received in Senate and held at desk: House amendments to Senate bill.
On September 9, 1986 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House by Unanimous Consent.
- House Committee on The Judiciary Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On September 2, 1986 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Administrative Law and Governmental Relations.
On August 15, 1986 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
On August 11, 1986 in the Senate:
- S.AMDT.2701 Amendment SP 2701 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.2701 Proposed by Senator Dole for Senator Grassley. To make technical and clarifying corrections.
- Committee substitute, as amended, agreed to by Voice Vote.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
On July 28, 1986 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 742.
- Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Thurmond with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 99-345.
On December 12, 1985 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On December 11, 1985 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary received executive comment from Justice Department.
On November 20, 1985 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary. Subcommittee on Criminal Law discharged from further consideration.
On November 19, 1985 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary. Hearings held on Section 5.
On November 7, 1985 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Administrative Practice&Procedure. Approved for full committee consideration with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On October 22, 1985 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary received executive comment from Justice Department.
On September 17, 1985 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Administrative Practice&Procedure. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 99-452.
On August 22, 1985 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary requested executive comment from Justice Department.
- Committee on Judiciary. Referred jointly to the Subcommittee on Administrative Practice and Procedure.
- Committee on Judiciary. Referred jointly to the Subcommittee on Criminal Law.
On August 1, 1985 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Amendments (2)
S.AMDT.2701
To make technical and clarifying corrections.
S.AMDT.3214
In the nature of a substitute.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor