+ − Summary
+ − Actions (7)
On September 19, 1990 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Provisions of measure incorporated into measure H.R. 2567 ordered to be reported.
On February 6, 1990 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Water and Power. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 101-669.
On January 8, 1990 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources requested executive comment from Department of the Army, Department of the Navy, and Office of Management and Budget.
On December 14, 1989 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources requested executive comment from the Department of the Interior, the Environmental Protection Agency, and the Office of Management and Budget.
On November 15, 1989 in the Senate:
- S.AMDT.1131 Referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. To clarify that all water rights transfers under Title IV of s.1554 shall be in accordance with Nevada state law.
On August 5, 1989 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Water and Power.
On August 4, 1989 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.1131
To clarify that all water rights transfers under Title IV of
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor