+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 117-100.
- Signed by President.
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1158-1159)
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H1158-1159)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1543.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1158-1159)
- Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On December 16, 2021 in the House:
- Held at the desk.
- Received in the House.
On December 15, 2021 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S9155-9156; text: CR S9155-9156)
- Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
On September 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 127.
- Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Murray with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
On August 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
- Introduced in Senate
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor