+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On November 13, 1975 in the Senate:
- Public law 94-127.
- Signed by President.
On November 3, 1975 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On October 31, 1975 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On October 20, 1975 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
- House agreed to conference report.
On October 9, 1975 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to conference report.
On October 3, 1975 in the House:
- Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 94-529.
On October 2, 1975 in the Senate:
- Conference report filed in Senate, S. Rept. 94-407.
On June 5, 1975 in the House:
- Conference scheduled in House.
On May 15, 1975 in the Senate:
- Conference scheduled in Senate.
On May 12, 1975 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended, in lieu of H.R. 3902 .
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by special rule in House.
On April 29, 1975 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Call of calendar in Senate.
On April 25, 1975 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar in Senate.
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Commerce, S. Rept. 94-96.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor