+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On October 11, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife and Oceans.
On October 6, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
- Referred to House Resources
- Referred to the Committee on Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
On September 29, 2000 in the House:
- Held at the desk.
- Received in the House.
On September 29, 2000 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On September 28, 2000 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.4278 Amendment SA 4278 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.4278 Amendment SA 4278 proposed by Senator Grams for Senator Snowe. To increase authorization levels for the National Estuarine Research Reserve System, and for other purposes.
- Measure laid before Senate.
On September 14, 2000 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 803.
- Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator McCain with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 106-412 .
On June 15, 2000 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On August 5, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.4278
To increase authorization levels for the National Estuarine Research Reserve System, and for other purposes.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor