+ − Actions (8)
On September 28, 1982 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Criminal Law. Approved for full committee consideration with an amendment favorably.
On August 20, 1982 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary received executive comment from Administrative Office of the U.S. Courts.
On May 21, 1982 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Courts. Approved for full committee consideration with an amendment favorably.
On November 16, 1981 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Courts. Hearings held.
On August 10, 1981 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary requested executive comment from Administrative Office of the U.S. Courts.
On July 31, 1981 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Courts.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Criminal Law.
On July 29, 1981 in the Senate:
- Read second time and referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor