+ − Actions (8)
On May 3, 1982 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
On April 29, 1982 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote.
On April 21, 1982 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Regular Orders. Calendar No. 507.
- Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Thurmond with amendments. With written report No. 97-357.
On April 20, 1982 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
- Subcommittee on Immigration and Refugee Policy. Approved for full committee consideration with amendments favorably.
On July 28, 1981 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Immigration and Refugee Policy.
On July 27, 1981 in the Senate:
- Read second time and referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor