+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On August 12, 1992 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 631.
- Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 102-372.
On June 25, 1992 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On June 11, 1992 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary. Committee consideration and Mark Up Session held.
On April 8, 1992 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary. Committee consideration held.
On July 23, 1991 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary. Hearings held.
On July 22, 1991 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor