+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On November 13, 2000 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 106-513.
- Signed by President.
On November 6, 2000 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On October 24, 2000 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1482 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Hansen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On October 18, 2000 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 18, 2000 in the House:
- Received in the House.
- Held at the desk.
On October 17, 2000 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.4322 Amendment SA 4322 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.4322 Amendment SA 4322 proposed by Senator Cochran for Senator Snowe. To amend the National Marine Sanctuaries Act, and for other purposes.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
On July 21, 2000 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 702.
- Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator McCain with amendments. With written report No. 106-353 .
On April 13, 2000 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
On August 4, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.4322
To amend the National Marine Sanctuaries Act, and for other purposes.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor