+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (9)
On September 4, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
On July 7, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
- Received in the House.
On July 7, 2003 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On June 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On June 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 179.
- Committee on Rules and Administration. Reported by Senator Lott without amendment. Without written report.
On June 24, 2003 in the Senate:
- Committee on Rules and Administration. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On January 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor