+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On November 3, 1988 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 100-595.
- Signed by President.
On October 28, 1988 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 19, 1988 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Senate agreed to the House amendments by Voice Vote.
On October 5, 1988 in the House:
- Message on House action received in Senate and held at desk: House amendments to Senate bill.
On October 4, 1988 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On September 29, 1988 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar No: 227.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Public Works and Transportation. Report No: 100-1007.
On September 27, 1988 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 6, 1988 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 1, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Public Buildings and Grounds.
On May 17, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Public Works and Transportation.
On May 17, 1988 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On May 16, 1988 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
On April 25, 1988 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 635.
- Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported to Senate by Senator Burdick without amendment. Without written report.
On April 22, 1988 in the Senate:
- Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On July 9, 1987 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor