+ − Actions (9)
On September 14, 1982 in the Senate:
- Indefinitely postponed by Senate by Voice Vote.
- Senate passed companion measure H.R. 5228 in lieu of this measure by Voice Vote.
On August 5, 1982 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Regular Orders. Calendar No. 743.
- Senate Committee on Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On March 24, 1982 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Criminal Law. Hearings held.
On December 10, 1981 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary. Re-referred jointly to the Subcommittee on Criminal Law.
- Committee on Judiciary. Re-referred jointly to the Subcommittee on Security and Terrorism.
On July 10, 1981 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Security and Terrorism.
On July 8, 1981 in the Senate:
- Read second time and referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor