+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On December 21, 2009 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 111-119.
- Signed by President.
On December 9, 2009 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On December 2, 2009 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1422 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Bishop moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On November 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On November 16, 2009 in the House:
- Held at the desk.
- Received in the House.
On November 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.2780 Amendment SA 2780 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.2780 Amendment SA 2780 proposed by Senator Reid for Senator Murray. To clarify a requirement concerning hours of service.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On July 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.2780
To clarify a requirement concerning hours of service.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor