+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On August 27, 1986 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 99-401.
- Signed by President.
On August 18, 1986 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On August 15, 1986 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On August 12, 1986 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Senate agreed to the House amendments. By Voice Vote.
On August 7, 1986 in the House:
- Message on House action received in Senate and held at desk: House amendments to Senate bill.
On August 4, 1986 in the House:
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
On August 1, 1985 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Voice Vote.
On July 31, 1985 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 270.
- Committee on Labor and Human Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Hatch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 99-123.
On July 10, 1985 in the Senate:
- Committee on Labor and Human Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On June 26, 1985 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Children, Family,Drugs and Alcohol. Approved for full committee consideration with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On May 2, 1985 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Children, Family,Drugs and Alcohol. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 99-196.
On March 11, 1985 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Children, Family,Drugs and Alcohol.
On January 3, 1985 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Labor and Human Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor