+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On December 4, 1980 in the Senate:
- Public Law 96-496.
- Signed by President.
On November 26, 1980 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
On November 25, 1980 in the Senate:
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On November 25, 1980 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On November 20, 1980 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
- Senate agreed to House amendments.
On November 17, 1980 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended, in lieu of H. R. 7153 .
- Measure considered in House.
- Committee on Education and Labor discharged in House.
On February 11, 1980 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Education and Labor.
On February 7, 1980 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Call of calendar in Senate.
On January 29, 1980 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Labor and Human Resources with amendment, S. Rept. 96-557.
On June 21, 1979 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Labor and Human Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor