+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On October 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 116-182. (TXT | PDF)
- Signed by President.
On October 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On September 21, 2020 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4582)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1380.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4582-4583)
- Ms. Jackson Lee moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On May 22, 2020 in the House:
- Held at the desk.
- Received in the House.
On May 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On May 20, 2020 in the Senate:
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.