+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On December 1, 1997 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 105-126.
- Signed by President.
On November 19, 1997 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On November 12, 1997 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. McHugh moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Postal Service.
On November 6, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to House House Oversight
- Referred to House Government Reform and Oversight
- Referred to the Committee on Government Reform and Oversight, and in addition to the Committee on House Oversight, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Received in the House.
On November 5, 1997 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor