+ − Summary
+ − Actions (6)
On May 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On November 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- Committee on Governmental Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 108-414.
On August 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- Committee on Governmental Affairs referred to Subcommittee on Financial Management, the Budget, and International Security.
On July 9, 2003 in the Senate:
- Star Print ordered on the bill.
On June 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor