+ − Actions (8)
On December 8, 1981 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Energy and Agricultural Taxation. Hearings held.
On July 30, 1981 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
On July 28, 1981 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
On July 20, 1981 in the Senate:
- Committee on Finance requested executive comment from OMB; Treasury Department; Energy Department.
On July 13, 1981 in the Senate:
- Committee on Finance, Subcommittee on Energy and Agricultural Taxation took the following actions.
- Referred jointly to Senate Committees on Energy and Natural Resources; Finance by unanimous consent with the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources to have jurisdiction over Titles II and III, and the Committee on Finance to have jurisdiction over Titles I and III.
On June 19, 1981 in the Senate:
- Committee on Finance requested executive comment from OMB; Treasury Department; Energy Department.
On June 11, 1981 in the Senate:
- Read second time and referred to Senate Committee on Finance.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor