+ − Actions (17)
On December 31, 1982 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 97-402.
- Signed by President.
On December 20, 1982 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On December 19, 1982 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On December 17, 1982 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House by Unanimous Consent.
- House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On December 15, 1982 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From Interior.
On December 6, 1982 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
On December 3, 1982 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote.
On October 1, 1982 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Regular Orders. Calendar No. 942.
- Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported to Senate by Senator Cohen with amendments. With written report No. 97-654.
On May 13, 1982 in the Senate:
- Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
On February 11, 1982 in the Senate:
- Committee on Indian Affairs. Committee consideration and Mark Up Session held.
On July 30, 1981 in the Senate:
- Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held.
On June 8, 1981 in the Senate:
- Read second time and referred to Senate Committee on Indian Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor