+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On July 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 117-26.
On June 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On June 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to section 11 of H. Res. 486, and the motion offered by Mr. McGovern, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 482; H.R. 704; H.R. 961, as amended; H.R. 1314; H.R. 2571, as amended; H.R. 2679, as amended; H.R. 2694; H.R. 2922, as amended; H.R. 3182; H.R. 3239; H.R. 3241, as amended; H.R. 3723; H.R. 3752; H.R. 3841; S. 409; and S. 1340. (consideration: CR H3026-3052; text: CR H3051)
On June 23, 2021 in the House:
- Passed/agreed to in House: Pursuant to section 11 of H. Res. 486, and the motion offered by Mr. McGovern, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 482; H.R. 704; H.R. 961, as amended; H.R. 1314; H.R. 2571, as amended; H.R. 2679, as amended; H.R. 2694; H.R. 2922, as amended; H.R. 3182; H.R. 3239; H.R. 3241, as amended; H.R. 3723; H.R. 3752; H.R. 3841; S. 409; and S. 1340.(consideration: CR H3026-3052; text: CR H3051)
- Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 486, proceedings on S. 1340 are considered vacated.
On June 22, 2021 in the House:
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2983-2984; text: CR H2983)
- Ms. Jackson Lee moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1340.
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
On June 21, 2021 in the House:
- Held at the desk.
- Received in the House.
On June 17, 2021 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S4618)
- Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S4618)
- Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4618)
- Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S4618)
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
- Introduced in Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor