+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On October 30, 1998 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 105-327.
- Signed by President.
On October 20, 1998 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On October 10, 1998 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On passage Passed without objection.
- Considered by unanimous consent.
- Mr. Hansen asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
- Committee on Resources discharged.
On October 5, 1998 in the House:
- Received in the House.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Referred to the House Committee on Resources.
On October 2, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On September 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 550.
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 105-311 .
On September 2, 1998 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources requested executive comment from Department of the Interior, OMB.
On July 29, 1998 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On July 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Parks, Preservation and Recreation. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 105-751.
On October 30, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Parks, Preservation and Recreation.
On October 29, 1997 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor