+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On January 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Bingaman under authority of the order of the Senate of 12/17/2011 with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 112-125 .
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On November 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 112-224.
On October 19, 2011 in the Senate:
On July 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor