+ − Summary
+ − Actions (5)
On November 30, 1987 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources received executive comment from Export-Import Bank of the United States. Unfavorable.
On October 6, 1987 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources received executive comment from Defense Department. Favorable.
On August 6, 1987 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Research and Development. Hearings held.
On July 21, 1987 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources requested executive comment from Energy Department, OMB, Defense Department , Export-Import Bank of the United States , Overseas Private Investment Corporation , Small Business Administration .
On June 3, 1987 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources and, pursuant to Rule XXV , if and when reported, to the Committee on Small Business.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor