+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 27, 1980 in the House:
- Motion to recommit Conference Report to Committee of Conference passed House, roll call #379 .
- Conference report considered in House.
On June 21, 1980 in the House:
- Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 96-1119.
On November 27, 1979 in the House:
- Conference scheduled in House.
On November 13, 1979 in the Senate:
- Conference scheduled in Senate.
On November 1, 1979 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended, in lieu of H. R. 4985 .
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by special rule in House.
On October 4, 1979 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended, roll call #336 .
- Measure considered in Senate.
On October 3, 1979 in the Senate:
- Measure considered in Senate.
On October 2, 1979 in the Senate:
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in Senate.
On September 25, 1979 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources with amendment, S. Rept. 96-331.
On June 11, 1979 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor