+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 15, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 112-119.
On May 10, 2012 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On May 7, 2012 in the House:
- Mr. Issa moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1302 .
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On April 26, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
On August 6, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
On August 5, 2011 in the House:
- Received in the House.
- Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
On August 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On August 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On July 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Boxer without amendment. With written report No. 112-40 .
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 117.
On July 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On June 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor