+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 6, 1986 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 679.
- Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Thurmond with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 99-320. Additional and minority views filed.
On May 8, 1986 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On May 1, 1986 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary. Committee consideration and Mark Up Session held.
On April 24, 1986 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary. Committee consideration and Mark Up Session held.
On July 29, 1985 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 99-522.
On July 25, 1985 in the Senate:
- S.AMDT.545 Referred to the Committee on Judiciary. To amend the Clayton Act, and for other purposes.
On June 17, 1985 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary requested executive comment from Justice Department, Commerce Department, Federal Trade Commission.
On June 13, 1985 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.545
To amend the Clayton Act, and for other purposes.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor