+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 11, 1994 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 103-233.
- Signed by President.
On March 30, 1994 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On March 25, 1994 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Senate agreed to the House amendments by Voice Vote.
On March 24, 1994 in the House:
- Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendments to Senate bill.
On March 22, 1994 in the House:
- A similar measure H.R. 4067 was laid on the table without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- The title of the measure was amended to that of similar measure H.R. 4067 . Agreed to without objection.
- On passage Passed without objection.
- The House struck all after the enacting clause and inserted in lieu thereof the provisions of a similar measure H.R. 4067 . Agreed to without objection.
- Considered by unanimous consent.
- Mr. Gonzalez asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
On November 20, 1993 in the House:
- Received in the House.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Held at the desk.
On November 19, 1993 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.1215 Amendment SP 1215 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.1215 Proposed by Senator Baucus for Senator Riegle. To make a series of amendments.
- Measure laid before Senate.
On November 9, 1993 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 275.
- Committee on Banking. Reported to Senate by Senator Riegle with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 103-174. Additional views filed.
On October 19, 1993 in the Senate:
- Committee on Banking. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On July 28, 1993 in the Senate:
- Committee on Banking. Hearings held.
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.1215
To make a series of amendments.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor