+ − Summary
+ − Actions (9)
On August 9, 1983 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From OMB.
On August 8, 1983 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from FEMA, OMB.
On July 14, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Water Resources.
On June 9, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Public Works and Transportation.
On May 26, 1983 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
On May 25, 1983 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Regular Orders. Calendar No. 182.
On May 16, 1983 in the Senate:
- Committee on Environment and Public Works. Original measure reported to Senate by Senator Humphrey. With written report No. 98-120.
- Committee on Environment and Public Works ordered to be reported an original measure.
On May 10, 1983 in the Senate:
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor