+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On December 1, 1980 in the House:
- Measure failed of passage in House under suspension of rules, roll call #652 .
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up under motion to suspend rules and pass in House.
On September 4, 1980 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Interstate and Foreign Commerce with amendment, H. Rept. 96-1286 .
On July 29, 1980 in the House:
- Referred jointly to House Committees on Science and Technology; and Interstate and Foreign Commerce.
On July 25, 1980 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in Senate.
On June 9, 1980 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources with amendment, S. Rept. 96-799.
On June 5, 1979 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor