+ − Summary
+ − Actions (10)
On October 11, 1974 in the House:
- Private Law 93-92.
- Signed by President.
On October 2, 1974 in the House:
- Measure presented to President.
On October 1, 1974 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
- Measure passed House.
On August 22, 1974 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on the Judiciary, H. Rept. 93-1323.
On March 20, 1974 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on the Judiciary.
On March 19, 1974 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
On March 13, 1974 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on the Judiciary, S. Rept. 93-731.
On March 19, 1973 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor