+ − Summary
+ − Actions (11)
On November 16, 1989 in the House:
- Held at the desk.
- Received in the House.
On November 16, 1989 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On November 15, 1989 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
On November 13, 1989 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 373.
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Johnston without amendment. With written report No. 101-201.
On November 1, 1989 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On September 14, 1989 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Water and Power. Hearings held.
On July 17, 1989 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources requested executive comment from the Environmental Protection Agency and Office of Management and Budget.
On July 11, 1989 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Water and Power.
On June 23, 1989 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor