+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 5, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On February 7, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Received in the House.
On February 7, 2002 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On February 6, 2002 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On November 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 215.
- Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Kennedy with an amendment. With written report No. 107-93 .
On August 1, 2001 in the Senate:
- Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
On July 31, 2001 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor