+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 4, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and Environment.
On January 27, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Commerce.
On November 22, 1999 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Held at the desk.
- Received in the House.
On November 19, 1999 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.2799 Amendment SP 2799 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.2799 Proposed by Senator Collins for Senator Harkin. To modify the authorization of appropriations.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- Senate Committee on HELP discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On June 23, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on HELP.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.2799
To modify the authorization of appropriations.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor